Global Patent Index - EP 1026311 A2

EP 1026311 A2 2000-08-09 - A recyclable carpet and a manufacturing process thereof

Title (en)

A recyclable carpet and a manufacturing process thereof

Title (de)

Wiederverwendbarer Teppich und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tapis recyclable et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1026311 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830024 A

Priority

IT FI990019 A

Abstract (en)

A process for the manufacture of a textile material for floor covering, in which a layer of needlepunched non-woven fabric made of synthetic fiber is formed, a layer of binder in an aqueous suspension of a water-resistant vinyl resin having hydrolizable functionalities sufficient to be dissolved when heated in a strongly basic solvent being applied thereon. The vinyl resin can include a polymer made of polyvinyl acetate. The floor covering material thus obtained is recyclable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4291 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 1/488 (2012.01); D04H 1/587 (2012.01); D04H 1/64 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/587 (2013.01); D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01); D04H 1/488 (2013.01); D04H 1/64 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D06N 7/0068 (2013.01); D06N 2201/02 (2013.01); D06N 2201/0245 (2013.01); D06N 2201/0254 (2013.01); D06N 2203/041 (2013.01); D06N 2203/045 (2013.01); D06N 2209/128 (2013.01); D06N 2211/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026311 A2 20000809; EP 1026311 A3 20030409; IT 1310002 B1 20020205; IT FI990019 A1 20000801; IT FI990019 D0 19990201

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06N 7/00 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04H 1/46 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04H 1/64 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI