Global Patent Index - EP 1026311 A3

EP 1026311 A3 20030409 - A recyclable carpet and a manufacturing process thereof

Title (en)

A recyclable carpet and a manufacturing process thereof

Title (de)

Wiederverwendbarer Teppich und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tapis recyclable et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1026311 A3 20030409 (EN)

Application

EP 00830024 A 20000118

Priority

IT FI990019 A 19990201

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026311A2] A process for the manufacture of a textile material for floor covering, in which a layer of needlepunched non-woven fabric made of synthetic fiber is formed, a layer of binder in an aqueous suspension of a water-resistant vinyl resin having hydrolizable functionalities sufficient to be dissolved when heated in a strongly basic solvent being applied thereon. The vinyl resin can include a polymer made of polyvinyl acetate. The floor covering material thus obtained is recyclable.

IPC 1-7

D06N 7/00; D04H 1/46; D04H 1/64

IPC 8 full level

D04H 1/4291 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 1/488 (2012.01); D04H 1/587 (2012.01); D04H 1/64 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01); D04H 1/488 (2013.01); D04H 1/587 (2013.01); D04H 1/64 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D06N 7/0068 (2013.01); D06N 2201/02 (2013.01); D06N 2201/0245 (2013.01); D06N 2201/0254 (2013.01); D06N 2203/041 (2013.01); D06N 2203/045 (2013.01); D06N 2209/128 (2013.01); D06N 2211/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0765960 A2 19970402 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [Y] BE 1005056 A3 19930406 - FARBER YVES
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 540 (C - 1115) 29 September 1993 (1993-09-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 037 (C - 680) 24 January 1990 (1990-01-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1026311 A2 20000809; EP 1026311 A3 20030409; IT 1310002 B1 20020205; IT FI990019 A1 20000801; IT FI990019 D0 19990201

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 00830024 A 20000118; IT FI990019 A 19990201