Global Patent Index - EP 1026313 A3

EP 1026313 A3 2001-05-09 - Band for making a web material

Title (en)

Band for making a web material

Title (de)

Band für Maschinen zur Herstellung von Materialbahnen

Title (fr)

Bande pour la fabrication d' un materiau en bande

Publication

EP 1026313 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123453 A

Priority

DE 19900989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026313A2] The fourdrinier (10) for a papermaking machine has a compound structure with longitudinal strength carriers (12,14,16), and a filling material (18) in the spaces between them which at least partially fills them out. The strength carriers (12,14,16) have a high thermal conductivity, as metal filaments with a circular cross section and/or as narrow strips and/or ribbons. At least some have a changing cross section along their length. The filling material (18) is of plastics. The fourdrinier is generally impermeable to liquids. The edges of the fourdrinier have a bead thickening formed by the carriers (12,14,16), the filling material (18) and/or an additional material or material mixture. At least one surface of the fourdrinier (10) has a closed structure formed by the carriers (12,14,16), and at least one surface is smooth, formed by the filling material (18). The fourdrinier structure is formed by weaving the carriers (12,14,16) together. An Independent claim is included for a fourdrinier prodn. process where the filaments (12,14,16) are woven together to form the material, and the spaces between them are at least partially filled by a plastics material (18). Preferred Features: The woven material is immersed in a fluid plastics (18) or is sprayed with the plastics liquid. After immersion or spraying, the surfaces are smoothed by grinding. Or the plastics coating is removed especially by scraping and/or pressing it into the intermediate spaces. The filaments are woven according to the required fourdrinier surface structure and especially according to the required heat dissipation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0027 (2013.01); D03D 15/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/10 (2013.01); Y10S 162/901 (2013.01); Y10S 162/902 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24777 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900989 A1 20000727; EP 1026313 A2 20000809; EP 1026313 A3 20010509; EP 1026313 B1 20050413; US 7005045 B1 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911904

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121126

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2005-07-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911904 P 20050519

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031128

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI