Global Patent Index - EP 1026315 A3

EP 1026315 A3 2001-03-07 - Device for treating a web

Title (en)

Device for treating a web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1026315 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125855 A

Priority

DE 19904373 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026315A2] The assembly to process a web, and especially of paper, has a rotating heated cylinder (1) where the web (2) passes round it pressed against the cylinder mantle by a continuous belt (5) of an elastic material, and especially rubber. A guide roller (8) for the belt (5) is on a fixed carrier (11) which swings between a tensioning setting for the belt (5) and a retracted position. An additional belt tensioner roller (18) is outside the belt (5), on a second fixed carrier (16) which swings between a retracted position and a setting where it presses externally against the belt (5) between the belt guide roller (8) and a neighboring belt guide roller (6). The belt guide rollers (6-8) are on a common carrier (11). The tensioning roller (18) is at a linkage on a cross beam (16) at the frame. The tensioning roller (18) also acts as a belt movement path control roller. The tensioning roller (18) is on a swing arm (17), which moves between the retracted setting and the belt tensioning position. The roller (18) swings on the arm (17), and especially round an axis (VII), to control the belt tension. The tensioning roller (18) faces the swing guide roller (8) on the side of the belt (5) away from the cylinder (1). Of the belt guide rollers (6-8), two rollers (6,7) are at the same level at a gap over the cylinder (1), and the third roller (8) is a swing roller at a lower level near the cylinder (1). The moving roller (8) is at the side towards the cylinder (1) in the tensioning setting, and near the fixed carrier (11) in the retracted position. A cylinder (13) is within the belt (5) loop with a belt press rod (14) which, in operation, presses the belt (5) against the cylinder (1), supported at the first carrier (11). At least one coolant spray tube (21) has jets to spray a coolant fluid on the belt (5), to one side and over the belt (5). The belt (5) moves at a speed so that at the contact line between the belt (5) and the cylinder (1) the speed difference is 10-30% to the web movement speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/00; D21H 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/001 (2013.01); D21H 25/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026315 A2 20000809; EP 1026315 A3 20010307; EP 1026315 B1 20040804; AT 272742 T 20040815; DE 19904373 A1 20000810; US 6365003 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051225

2005-12-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910126 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI