Global Patent Index - EP 1026316 A2

EP 1026316 A2 2000-08-09 - Calender for web materials like paper

Title (en)

Calender for web materials like paper

Title (de)

Kalander für bahnförmige Materialien wie Papier

Title (fr)

Calandre pour des matériaux en bande comme le papier

Publication

EP 1026316 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100896 A

Priority

DE 19904451 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly to process web materials, such as of paper, has at least one center roller (7,9,11) for a roller separation in relation to an adjacent roller, which can be moved laterally and at right angles to the plane (13) of the roller stack (4). The lower roller (12) can be lowered in the stack (4) along the roller plane (13), for roller separation, and the lowest center roller (11) can be moved laterally. The bottom roller (12) has a controlled bending action, and the lowering movement is restricted to the mantle stroke limit. The plane (13) of the calender rollers is pitched at an angle to the horizontal, and at least one of the center rollers (7,9,11) with a lateral movement is shifted at a downwards angle out of the roller plane (13), through the action of a hydrocylinder (32-34). The bearing mountings (16,22,28) of at least one center roller (7,9,11) with a lateral shift movement are carried by levers (18,23,29), on pivot axes (20,24,30) at the columns (1). The hydrocylinders (32-34) move the bearing mountings in relation to the levers or the levers in relation to the pivot axes (20,24,30) or the pivot axes in relation to the columns. The bearing mountings are moved through swivel joints at the levers. At least one movable center roller (9,11) is a hard roller. The upper roller (5) is a controlled bending roller with a mantle stroke movement and a carrier (14) fixed to the columns. The uppermost center roller (6) is in a fixed mounting at the columns. At least one center roller (7-11) is carried by levers (18,23,26,29), which pivot on axes (20,21,24,27,30) at the columns (1), with limit stops to prevent a lowering movement of the center rollers (7-11). The bottom center roller (11) and the lower roller (12) have a lateral shifting movement to form a single working nip where the other roller nips are open.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kalander für bahnförmige Materialien, wie Papier, besitzt einen Ständer (1) und einen Walzenstapel (4), der eine Unterwalze (12), eine Oberwalze (5) und mindestens eine dazwischen angeordnete Mittelwalze (6 bis 11) aufweist. Mindestens eine Mittelwalze (9, 11) ist zwecks Walzentrennung relativ zur Nachbarwalze in einer etwa senkrecht zur Stapelebene (13) verlaufenden Querrichtung verlagerbar. Auf diese Weise ergibt sich eine rasche Walzentrennung, weil der größte Teil der Trennvorgänge gleichzeitig erfolgt. Außerdem erhält man für eine gegebene Anzahl von Walzen im Stapel eine geringe Bauhöhe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026316 A2 20000809; EP 1026316 A3 20010816; EP 1026316 B1 20040331; DE 19904451 A1 20000817; DE 19904451 B4 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070118

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070118

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070118

2006-01-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005835 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI