Global patent index - EP 1026317 A2

EP 1026317 A2 2000-08-09 - Calender

Title (en)

Calender

Title (de)

Kalander

Title (fr)

Calandre

Publication

EP 1026317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100897 A

Priority

DE 19904180 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly has a stack of rollers forming nips between them to process a web. A moving web guide (11) in on at least one side of the stacked rollers (2) which can be fixed in at least one web insertion position. The web guide (11) is fixed in a park position where it does not shroud any of the roller nips (5,25,27). The web guide (11) is attached to a moving platform (12) at one side of the roller stack (2). Position switches are along the movement path (13), at the web insertion positions, linked to a drive control. The web guide has a guide surface structure (15,16) in a variable shape using a flat surface (21) and deflection surfaces (15,16) moving out of it on swing levers (17,18). The deflection surface (15,16) can be on a push unit across the direction of movement. The guide surface structure has at least one tongue which can be pushed as far as the roller stack (2). The web guide (11) has at least one grip head which, in the first movement phase, moves from the roller stack (2) at right angles to it. In the second movement phase, it moves parallel to the rollers and, in a third phase, moves towards the rollers (2) at right angles to them. The grip head has a suction and/or blower unit. The grip head can rotate by 180 degrees round an axis, parallel to the axes of the rollers (3,4). The grip head grasps the web (8) at the side. The rollers are in an angled stack (2).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kalander (1) angegeben mit einem Walzenstapel (2), der mehrere Walzen (3, 4) aufweist, die zwischen sich Nips (5, 25, 27) zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn (8) bilden, und mit einer Einführhilfe zum Leiten eines Materialbahnanfangs durch den Walzenstapel (2). Hierbei möchte man im Betrieb Störungsmöglichkeiten durch die Einführhilfe verringern können. Dazu ist auf mindestens einer Seite des Walzenstapels (2) eine bewegliche Bahnführungseinrichtung (11) angeordnet, die in mindestens einer Einführposition festlegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026317 A2 20000809; EP 1026317 A3 20010516; EP 1026317 B1 20031001; DE 19904180 C1 20000831; US 6402889 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003869

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI