Global patent index - EP 1026335 A2

EP 1026335 A2 2000-08-09 - Prefabricated concrete element

Title (en)

Prefabricated concrete element

Title (de)

Betonfertigteil

Title (fr)

Elément préfabriqué en béton

Publication

EP 1026335 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101467 A

Priority

DE 29901873 U

Abstract (en)

The section consists of lower section with a right-angled cross-section (1, 14, 19, 21) and, at least, one projecting connecting section above the upper side of the lower section. The to-be-mounted concrete fixture (4), on the fabricated section, has a key-locked connection. The connecting section has a steel-concrete mount with a right-angled cross-section, with a section of it being in contact with the upper surface of a push-connected transferring structure. The longitudinal reinforcement of the steel-concrete mount may be pre-stressed. The lower section and the mount may be one-piece in relation to each other.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Platten- bzw. balkenförmigen, durch Ortbeton (4) ergänzbaren Betonfertigteil, insbesondere Stahl-, Spann- oder Faserbetonfertigteil, bestehend aus einem Unterteil mit im wesentlichen rechteckigem Querschnitt und aus mindestens einem über die Oberseite des Unterteils hervorstehenden Verbundteil, das mit dem auf das Stahlbetonfertigteil aufzubringenden Ortbeton (4) einen kraftschlüssigen Verbund bildet, auch bei größeren Stützweiten der endgültigen Massivplatten im Bauzustand ohne Hilfsunterstützungen auszukommen, ist das Verbundteil ein mit der Bewehrung des Unterteils verbundener Stahlbetonsteg (1, 14, 19, 21), bei dem mindestens ein Teil der mit dem Ortbeton (4) in Kontakt kommenden Oberfläche eine Verbundkräfte übertragende Struktur aufweist, wobei der Steg (1, 14, 19, 21) einen etwa rechteckigen Querschnitt aufweist und die die Verbundkräfte übertragende Struktur an den Stegseitenflächen (3) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2006.01); E04B 5/36 (2006.01); E04C 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E04B 5/36 (2013.01); E04C 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901873 U1 20000224; EP 1026335 A2 20000809; EP 1026335 A3 20010425

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061015

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040607

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 5/38 A, 7E 04B 5/36 B, 7E 04B 5/23 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI