Global Patent Index - EP 1026339 A3

EP 1026339 A3 2000-11-02 - Post

Title (en)

Post

Title (de)

Pfosten

Title (fr)

Poteau

Publication

EP 1026339 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101483 A

Priority

DE 29901646 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026339A2] The post (1) comprises two or more post sections (4a, 4b) joined together by a rotating body (5) containing at least one cavity for receiving a strap (3), hand rail mounting bracket (21) or hand rail (2). The rotating body is a ball bearing or a cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01); E04H 17/14 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1834 (2013.01); E04H 17/1413 (2013.01); E04H 17/20 (2013.01); E04H 2017/1465 (2013.01); E04H 2017/1482 (2013.01); E04H 2017/1491 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901646 U1 19990602; EP 1026339 A2 20000809; EP 1026339 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI