Global Patent Index - EP 1026340 A3

EP 1026340 A3 2000-11-02 - Panels for forming a floor covering

Title (en)

Panels for forming a floor covering

Title (de)

Paneelen zur Bildung eines Fussbodenbelages

Title (fr)

Panneaux pour former un revêtement de sol

Publication

EP 1026340 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100880 A

Priority

CH 20099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026340A2] The lower side of the panels (1) include a tile (5), at least locally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/181 (2013.01); E04F 15/04 (2013.01); E04F 2201/05 (2013.01); E04F 2290/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026340 A2 20000809; EP 1026340 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI