Global Patent Index - EP 1026343 A1

EP 1026343 A1 2000-08-09 - Lock with a two part fixed lock body

Title (en)

Lock with a two part fixed lock body

Title (de)

Schloss mit zweiteiligem festgesetzem Körper

Title (fr)

Verrou comportant un corps de verrou fixe en deux parties

Publication

EP 1026343 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400258 A

Priority

FR 9901394 A

Abstract (en)

The lock (10) for a motor vehicle door has a rotor assembly (50,80) with a closed ended tube having a slot in its end face for a key. The fixed lock casing is formed in two axial sections (20,24) which are axially fixed for rotation by lugs (102) with springs for locking the assembly together.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un verrou (10) du type comportant un mécanisme (50, 80) monté à rotation et retenu axialement à l'intérieur d'un corps fixe de verrou (12) en forme de chemise annulaire cylindrique fermée à son extrémité axiale avant par un élément de fond transversal (42) et dont la face transversale d'extrémité arrière (88) comporte une ouverture centrale pour le passage d'une clef, caractérisé en ce que le corps fixe de verrou est réalisé en deux parties axiales arrière (20) et avant (24) qui sont solidarisées axialement et en rotation par des moyens d'assemblage (100, 102) du type à baïonnette comportant des moyens (136) de blocage automatique de l'assemblage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/04; E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/084 (2013.01); E05B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026343 A1 20000809; FR 2789431 A1 20000811; FR 2789431 B1 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031014

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI