Global Patent Index - EP 1026345 A1

EP 1026345 A1 2000-08-09 - Lock comprising a system for electrically assisted opening of a vehicle wing

Title (en)

Lock comprising a system for electrically assisted opening of a vehicle wing

Title (de)

Schloss mit einem System für elektrische Öffnungshilfe eines Kraftfahrzeugflügels

Title (fr)

Serrure pour ouvrant de véhicule comportant un système électrique d'assistance a l'ouverture

Publication

EP 1026345 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400071 A

Priority

FR 9901377 A

Abstract (en)

The servo assisted locking circuit for a motor vehicle has an electric motor (1) to drive a control cam (2) to open the lock. A control circuit (3) is operated by manual movement of the handle (9) to supply current to the motor. The handle has an auxiliary movement for mechanical opening of the lock if the electric circuit fails. A mechanical stop (B) is operated by the cam control circuit, which is released (L) by a pre-movement of the handle.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure comportant un système électrique d'assistance (A) à l'ouverture comprenant un moteur électrique (1) propre à entraîner un organe de commande (2) de l'ouverture en réponse à une alimentation électrique, et un système de pilotage (3) actionné par une course dite "électrique" d'un moyen manuel (9) pour assurer l'alimentation électrique du moteur (1), ce moyen manuel (9) pouvant effectuer une course supplémentaire au-delà de la course électrique pour un secours mécanique d'ouverture en cas de panne électrique. La serrure comprend un moyen de blocage mécanique (B) de l'entraînement par le système électrique de l'organe de commande (2) en position de fermeture, et des moyens de libération (L) du blocage mécanique sont prévus pour être actionnés lors d'une première partie de la course du moyen manuel (9), qui précède la course électrique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026345 A1 20000809; EP 1026345 B1 20020508; DE 60000151 D1 20020613; DE 60000151 T2 20021002; ES 2176153 T3 20021201; FR 2789432 A1 20000811; FR 2789432 B1 20010406

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170227

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE, CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60000151

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000151

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000151

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000151

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176153 T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000151 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI