Global Patent Index - EP 1026347 A1

EP 1026347 A1 2000-08-09 - Vehicle door handle with improved mounting means for the gripping member

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle with improved mounting means for the gripping member

Title (de)

Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeuge mit verbesserten Mitteln zur Montage des Griffelements

Title (fr)

Poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens perfectionnés de montage d'un levier de préhension

Publication

EP 1026347 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400255 A

Priority

FR 9901398 A

Abstract (en)

Door handle has external gripping lever (16) articulated on internal handle support (14). Lever has at one rear end activating foot (26) with connection (118) for engaging with reverse (100). Lever is mounted on support by globally transverse approach movement from outside to inside as far as intermediate position and by longitudinal hooking movement. Shaft (20) and support are engaged by articulation during hooking movement and rear foot connection engages reverse to prevent return of lever to its intermediate position.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose une poignée de véhicule automobile comportant un levier de préhension externe (16) articulé sur un support de poignée (14) interne, et du type dans lequel le levier (16) comporte, à une extrémité arrière, un pied d'actionnement (26) et qui comporte des moyens de liaison (118) pour coopérer avec un renvoi (100), caractérisée en ce que le levier (16) est monté sur le support (14) par un mouvement d'approche globalement transversal jusqu'à une position intermédiaire, et par un mouvement d'accrochage longitudinal au cours duquel le timon (20) et le support (14) entrent en coopération par des moyens d'articulation, et au cours duquel les moyens de liaison (118) du pied arrière (26) s'enclenchent sur le renvoi (100) pour empêcher un retour du levier (16) vers sa position intermédiaire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 3/00; E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 3/02 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01); E05B 3/00 (2006.01); E05B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026347 A1 20000809; EP 1026347 B1 20040714; DE 60012056 D1 20040819; DE 60012056 T2 20050804; ES 2225034 T3 20050316; FR 2789429 A1 20000811; FR 2789429 B1 20010413; JP 2000225844 A 20000815; JP 4637313 B2 20110223

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20160428

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60012056

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012056

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012056

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225034 T3

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012056 P 20040819

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI