Global Patent Index - EP 1026351 A1

EP 1026351 A1 2000-08-09 - Handle for a motor vehicle wing comprising improved means for blocking an external element

Title (en)

Handle for a motor vehicle wing comprising improved means for blocking an external element

Title (de)

Griff für einen Kraftfahrzeugflügel mit verbesserten Blockierungsmitteln für ein Aussenteil

Title (fr)

Poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens perfectionnés de blocage d'un élément externe

Publication

EP 1026351 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400264 A

Priority

FR 9901397 A

Abstract (en)

Handle has support (14) placed in internal door space. External handle part (56) has fixing heel (60) engaged transversely to inside through hole in outer panel (12) and fixed to support. Handle has locking part (68), for fixing heel, moving on support and controlled between unlocking and locking positions by control mechanism (84) and maneuvered through opening (98) in door edge panel (96).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose une poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant un support de poignée (14) qui est agencé dans un espace intérieur de l'ouvrant, du type dans lequel un élément externe (56) de la poignée est muni d'un talon de fixation (60) qui est engagé transversalement vers l'intérieur au travers d'un orifice aménagé dans le panneau extérieur (12) pour être rendu solidaire du support de poignée (14), caractérisée en ce que la poignée comporte un organe de blocage (68) du talon de fixation (60), l'organe de blocage (68) étant monté mobile sur le support de poignée (14) et étant commandé entre une position de déblocage et une position de blocage par un mécanisme de commande (84) qui est susceptible d'être manoeuvré au travers d'une ouverture (98) aménagée dans le panneau de chant (96) de l'ouvrant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 3/00; E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01); Y10S 292/41 (2013.01); Y10T 292/82 (2015.04); Y10T 292/858 (2015.04); Y10T 292/865 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026351 A1 20000809; EP 1026351 B1 20050615; DE 60020755 D1 20050721; DE 60020755 T2 20060518; DE 60045398 D1 20110127; EP 1574638 A1 20050914; EP 1574638 B1 20101215; EP 1574638 B2 20161207; ES 2243213 T3 20051201; ES 2357961 T3 20110504; FR 2789428 A1 20000811; FR 2789428 B1 20010413; JP 2000226955 A 20000815; JP 4542655 B2 20100915; US 6523871 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60020755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2011-04-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20101214

2006-05-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH. & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20060314

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2243213

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030821

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI