Global Patent Index - EP 1026352 A1

EP 1026352 A1 2000-08-09 - Lock fitting of the espagnolette or espagnolette-lock type

Title (en)

Lock fitting of the espagnolette or espagnolette-lock type

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag mit Treibstangen oder Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage de type crémone ou crémone-serrure

Publication

EP 1026352 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440004 A

Priority

FR 9901422 A

Abstract (en)

The bolt lock has a sleeve (5) with rack teeth to drive the bolt across a frame (9). The sleeve has a rotary hub (14). The lock casing has an opening in one wall to support one end of the hub. The opening is rectangular to allow movement of the sleeve between meshed and released positions with the bolt.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à une ferrure de verrouillage de type crémone ou crémone-serrure comprenant un mécanisme de commande logé dans un boîtier et comportant au moins un fouillot (5) pourvu d'une denture ou analogue sur laquelle vient s'engréner au moins une crémaillère associée directement ou au travers d'un chevalet (9) à une tringle de manoeuvre, ledit fouillot (5) comportant, en son centre, un moyeu (14) dont les extrémités, de part et d'autre de ce fouillot (5), sont maintenues en rotation dans des ouvertures et/ou logements prévus à cet effet au niveau des parois verticales avant et arrière dudit boîtier. Cette ferrure est caractérisée par le fait que l'ouverture ou le logement dans l'une des parois du boîtier et recevant, pour le maintien en rotation, l'une des extrémités du moyeu (14), est de forme oblongue s'étendant perpendiculairement à la ou les tringles de manoeuvre et autorisant le déplacement du fouillot (5) entre une première position non engrénée sur la crémaillère et une seconde position (23) dans laquelle sa denture est engagée sur cette dernière. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01); E05B 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 9/00 (2013.01); E05B 17/0004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026352 A1 20000809; EP 1026352 B1 20040407; DE 60009588 D1 20040513; DE 60009588 T2 20050407; ES 2218091 T3 20041116; FR 2789434 A1 20000811; FR 2789434 B1 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130930

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070107

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060107

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060107

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-02-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218091

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI