Global patent index - EP 1026355 A2

EP 1026355 A2 2000-08-09 - Door frame jamb

Title (en)

Door frame jamb

Title (de)

Türpfosten

Title (fr)

Montant d' huisserie

Publication

EP 1026355 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300257 A

Priority

US 11609899 P

Abstract (en)

A door frame jamb assembly is provided for holding a door and is constructed as an integral unit for transport to the construction site and attachment to a door frame opening. The frame assembly is constructed of several portions, including a jamb portion (24) which is formed of wood and is the portion attachable to the door frame opening (12), a rigid vinyl extender portion (26) which is formed of cellular resin and is attached to the end of the jamb portion, and a rigid brick molding portion (44) which is also formed of cellular resin and has a notch (48) formed therein to receive the second end of the vinyl extender portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/08 (2006.01); E06B 1/30 (2006.01); E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026355 A2 20000809; EP 1026355 A3 20020710; AU 1000000 A 20000720; CA 2294407 A1 20000715; CN 1263198 A 20000816; JP 2000213236 A 20000802; KR 20000053498 A 20000825; NZ 502137 A 20000623; TW 422910 B 20010221; ZA 200000077 B 20000712

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020801

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 1/04 A, 7E 06B 1/32 B

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARLEY MOULDINGS LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COPE, CARROLL W.

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI