Global patent index - EP 1026359 A1

EP 1026359 A1 2000-08-09 - Seal for roller shutter box

Title (en)

Seal for roller shutter box

Title (de)

Dichtung für Rolladenkasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'obturation de caisson de volet roulant

Publication

EP 1026359 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440023 A

Priority

FR 9901268 A

Abstract (en)

Shutter casing has under face with slot through where shutter winds into casing. Final slat (15) is fixed to sealing device (16) and takes shape of running section (17,17A) engaging with slot edges when shutter is reassembled. Two sections have flanges (20,20A) perpendicular to median plane of final slat and fastening shoulders (32) engaging complementary shoulders (33) equipping final slat. Sections are completed by locking means (34) in combination with fastening shoulders defining fixing means.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif d'obturation (16) d'un caisson de volet roulant comportant une sous-face pourvue d'une fente, délimitée par des bordures, et au travers de laquelle défile un tablier, s'enroulant dans ledit caisson, et comportant une lame finale (15) de laquelle est rendu solidaire ledit dispositif d'obturation (16) adoptant la forme d'au moins un profilé (17, 17A) filant coopérant, lorsque ledit tablier est remonté, avec les bordures de la fente. Ce dispositif adopte la forme de deux profilés (17, 17A) comportant au moins une aile (20, 20A) perpendiculaire au plan médian (P) de la lame finale (15) ainsi que des moyens d'accrochage (32) coopérant avec des moyens d'accrochage complémentaires (33) équipant ladite lame finale (15), lesdits profilés (17, 17A) étant complétés par des moyens (34) de verrouillage, sur cette dernière, définissant, en combinaison avec lesdits moyens d'accrochage (32), lesdits moyens de fixation (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17076 (2013.01); E06B 9/17046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026359 A1 20000809; EP 1026359 B1 20051005; DE 60022923 D1 20051110; DE 60022923 T2 20060706; ES 2250090 T3 20060416; FR 2789114 A1 20000804; FR 2789114 B1 20021031

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100128

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2250090

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-11-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60022923

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-11-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031110

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI