Global Patent Index - EP 1026360 A1

EP 1026360 A1 2000-08-09 - Installation bracket

Title (en)

Installation bracket

Title (de)

Haltebügel

Title (fr)

Console de montage

Publication

EP 1026360 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300840 A

Priority

  • EP 00300840 A
  • EP 99200328 A

Abstract (en)

Installation bracket (10) for mounting a head rail (100) of an architectural covering on a wall or ceiling, the bracket (10) having a generally L-shaped main body (12) which can be secured to the wall or ceiling and which comprises a top wall (14), a rear wall (16), a forwardly extending, supporting leg (28, 30) on a front end of the top wall (14) for receiving a front rim (108) of the head rail (100), and a movably mounted locking member (44), movable between a first position in which the head rail (100) can be positioned or removed from the bracket and a second position in which the head rail (100) is locked on the bracket (10); the locking member (44) being pivotally mounted on a projection (38) that extends forwardly from the rear wall (16) and is generally parallel to the top wall (14), and the locking member (44) being adapted to swivel between the first and second positions in a plane substantially parallel to the top wall (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/323

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026360 A1 20000809; EP 1026360 B1 20020828

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120203

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60000356

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120204

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120203

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070203

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000356 20021002

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI