Global Patent Index - EP 1026361 A3

EP 1026361 A3 2001-12-05 - Slat construction

Title (en)

Slat construction

Title (de)

Lamellenkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Construction d'une lamelle

Publication

EP 1026361 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102458 A

Priority

IT TV990008 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026361A2] The slats have at least one round hole (11) along their length axis, which has a periphery (12) with a border designed to act as a spacer element between the slat and another slat above or below it. The border has no sharp edges and allows optimum passage of the pull cord through the hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/386; E06B 9/303

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/303 (2006.01); E06B 9/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/303 (2013.01); E06B 9/386 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 2569866 A 19511002 - HARRY NELSON

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026361 A2 20000809; EP 1026361 A3 20011205; IT 248092 Y1 20021210; IT TV990008 U1 20000807

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI