Global Patent Index - EP 1026362 A1

EP 1026362 A1 2000-08-09 - Covering for a light- or ventilation shaft and profiled member therefor

Title (en)

Covering for a light- or ventilation shaft and profiled member therefor

Title (de)

Abdeckung für Licht- und/oder Lüftungsschächte sowie Profilstab hierfür

Title (fr)

Système de couverture pour soupirail ou canal de ventilation et son membre profilé

Publication

EP 1026362 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100893 A

Priority

DE 19903836 A

Abstract (en)

The cover comprises a frame consisting of several profile rods (4) with a therein held fabric (3), especially a metal fabric. The profile rods comprise a holding section (5) open towards the frame interior, in which the fabric is held at the edges, whereby the holding section is shaped, at least in points, in such way, that the fabric is pressed at it. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding profile rod, and a connecting angle for respectively two profile rods.

Abstract (de)

Abdeckung für Licht- und/oder Lüftungsschächte, umfassend einen aus mehreren Profilstäben (4) bestehenden Rahmen mit einem darin gehalterten Gewebe (3), insbesondere ein Metallgewebe, wobei die Profilstäbe (4) einen zum Rahmeninneren offenen Halteabschnitt (5) aufweisen, in dem das Gewebe (3) randseitig aufgenommen ist, wobei der Halteabschnitt (5) zumindest punktuell derart verformt ist, daß das Gewebe (3) am Halteabschnitt (5) eingepreßt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/52; E04F 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/04 (2013.01); E04F 17/06 (2013.01); E06B 9/52 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9311148 U1 19931111 - WAGNER GERHARD [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026362 A1 20000809; EP 1026362 B1 20051102; AT 308664 T 20051115; DE 19903836 A1 20000824; DE 19903836 C2 20021017; DE 19903836 C5 20060706; DE 50011475 D1 20051208

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011475 P 20051208

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI LU

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI LU

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010120

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI LU

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI