Global Patent Index - EP 1026364 A1

EP 1026364 A1 2000-08-09 - Profiled element for a rotary drilling device and drill string having at least one of said elements

Title (en)

Profiled element for a rotary drilling device and drill string having at least one of said elements

Title (de)

Profiliertes Element für eine Drehbohrvorrichtung und Bohrgestänge mit mindestens einem solchen Element

Title (fr)

Elément profilé pour un équipement de forage rotatif et tige de forage comportant au moins un tronçon profilé

Publication

EP 1026364 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400190 A

Priority

FR 9901391 A

Abstract (en)

The drill (1) has an overall shape of revolution, an axis (4) parallel to the drill axis, and radial projections (15, 20) and hollows (16, 19) on the external surface forming helices around the axis of rotation of the drill. Over at least part of the length of the element (3), at least one geometrical and dimensional characteristic of the hollows and protrusions varies along the element The element is a section of a drill string and the hollows or grooves of the helix provide a transverse passage in a plane perpendicular to the axis of the drill, decreasing in the axial direction and the direction of flow of the drilling fluid in an annulus between the drill and the hole. The grooves have a decreasing size and/or depth in the circumferential direction of the drill, in the direction of flow of the drilling fluid. Similarly, the protrusions increase in size in the direction of drilling and from bottom to top. Upstream of the section with variable profile is a section (10) of uniform profile also containing grooves (13) forming helices around the axis of the drill. The grooves on the variable profile section are extensions of the grooves on the uniform profile section. Drill string containing one, two or three such elements.

Abstract (fr)

L'élément ou tronçon profilé (3) présente une forme globale de révolution à génératrices droites ou courbes et un axe dirigé suivant l'axe de rotation du forage. Il comporte des parties en saillie ou nervures (14,15,20) et des parties en creux ou rainures (13,16,19) disposées suivant des hélices ayant pour axe l'axe du forage rotatif. Sur au moins une partie (10,11) de la longueur de l'élément profilé (3), dans la direction axiale, l'une au moins des caractéristiques géométriques et dimensionnelles des parties en creux (13,16,19) et des parties en saillie (14,15,20) varie suivant la direction axiale de l'élément profilé (3). De préférence, l'élément profilé (3) comporte, dans au moins une partie profilée variablé (11) des passages en forme de rainures (16) à section cumulée décroissante dans une direction de circulation du fluide de forage. On obtient ainsi un effet de palier hydrodynamique par formation d'un débit de fuite circonférentiel (18) du fluide de forage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/10; E21B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/10 (2006.01); E21B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/22 (2013.01); E21B 17/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026364 A1 20000809; EP 1026364 B1 20050608; AT 297497 T 20050615; DE 60020618 D1 20050714; FR 2789438 A1 20000811; FR 2789438 B1 20010504; NO 20000556 A 20000807; NO 20000556 D0 20000203; NO 20064023 A 20000807; NO 322967 B1 20061218; NO 328794 B1 20100518; US 6349779 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-30 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-10-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060309

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020618 P 20050714

2005-06-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI