Global Patent Index - EP 1026365 A2

EP 1026365 A2 2000-08-09 - Liner assembly and method of running the same

Title (en)

Liner assembly and method of running the same

Title (de)

Auskleidungsrohr-Einrichtung und Verfahren für seine Einführung

Title (fr)

Colonne perdue et procédé pour son installation

Publication

EP 1026365 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300442 A

Priority

GB 9902683 A

Abstract (en)

A liner assembly which comprises: (a) a liner (3); (b) a non-return valve at or adjacent the downstream end of said liner (3); (c) a liner hanger assembly (5) at or adjacent the upstream end of said liner (3); (d) a running tool (9) releasably connected to said liner hanger assembly (5); and (e) a plug (10) at or adjacent the upstream end of said liner (3) and defining with said non-return valve (4) and said liner (3) an isolated space (16), said plug (10) having a unit (13, 14) which can be acted upon to allow fluid to pass into said isolated space (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026365 A2 20000809; EP 1026365 A3 20010509; AU 1488700 A 20000810; CA 2298298 A1 20000806; GB 2346398 A 20000809; GB 9902683 D0 19990331; NO 20000383 A 20000807; NO 20000383 D0 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040210

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 33/14 A, 7E 21B 43/10 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI