Global Patent Index - EP 1026369 A1

EP 1026369 A1 2000-08-09 - Steam turbine

Title (en)

Steam turbine

Title (de)

Dampfturbine

Title (fr)

Turbine à vapeur

Publication

EP 1026369 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810092 A

Priority

EP 99810092 A

Abstract (en)

Steam turbines with or without regulation stage are built with the same amount of control valves (8, 9) for the steam inlet, and respectively two control valves are preferably provided. The valve assembly group (7), the outer turbine casing (1), and parts of the inner turbine casing (2) are built constructively equal, and can be used for steam turbines with or without regulation stage. The inner casing is equipped with integrated nozzle boxes (15,16) separated through partitions (17 18), in case of a steam turbine with regulation stage, and nozzle boxes and partitions are missing in steam turbines without regulation stage. An Independent claim is included for manufacturing an outer casing of steam turbine.

Abstract (de)

Dampfturbinen mit oder ohne Regelstufe werden mit der gleichen Anzahl Regelventilen (8, 9) gebaut. Vorzugsweise sind jeweils zwei Regelventile vorhanden. Die Ventilbaugruppe (7), das Turbinenaussengehäuse (1) und Teile des Turbineninnengehäuses (2) werden konstruktiv gleich gebaut und können für Dampfturbinen mit oder ohne Regelstufe verwendet werden. Bei der dargestellten Dampfturbine mit Regelstufe ist das Innengehäuse mit integrierten Düsenkästen (15, 16) versehen, die durch Zwischenwände (17, 18) voneinander getrennt sind. Bei einer Dampfturbine ohne Regelstufe fehlen die Düsenkästen und dementsprechend auch die Zwischenwände (17, 18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/24 (2013.01); F05D 2230/61 (2013.01); Y10S 415/915 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026369 A1 20000809; EP 1026369 B1 20031203; DE 59907932 D1 20040115; JP 2000227007 A 20000815; US 6302644 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-02-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907932

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030127

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI