Global patent index - EP 1026373 A2

EP 1026373 A2 2000-08-09 - Device for purifying the exhaust gas from an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for purifying the exhaust gas from an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Reinigung des Abgases einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de purification des gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1026373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100868 A

Priority

DE 19904068 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for purifying the exhaust gas from an internal combustion (IC) engine (3) comprises an exhaust gas pipe (2) with a particle filter (5) arranged in it to filter out particles in the exhaust gas. An ozone source (8) is provided which releases ozone into the exhaust gas before the gas reaches the filter.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zur Reinigung des Abgases einer Brennkraftmaschine, mit einer Abgasleitung und einem darin angeordneten Partikelfilter (5a) zum Filtern von im Abgas enthaltenen Partikeln. Zur wenigstens teilweisen Beseitigung der Partikel ist eine Ozonquelle (7) vorgesehen, die Ozon an das Abgas in der Abgasleitung an einer Abgabestelle (8) abgibt, bevor das Abgas zum Partikelfilter gelangt, wodurch ein verbesserter Abbrand der Partikelteilchen bewirkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/029

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/029 (2006.01); F01N 3/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/035 (2013.01); F01N 3/029 (2013.01); F01N 2240/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904068 A1 20000803; EP 1026373 A2 20000809; EP 1026373 A3 20030709

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01N 3/029 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01N 3/023 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01N 3/035 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI