Global Patent Index - EP 1026393 A2

EP 1026393 A2 2000-08-09 - Injector for the injection system of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Injector for the injection system of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Injektor für eine Einspritzanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Injecteur pour système d'injection de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1026393 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101964 A

Priority

DE 19904720 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel-injection unit injector includes a nozzle or jet body (700) having at least one outlet aperture (710) for injection of fuel into a combustion chamber of a combustion engine. The nozzle or jet needle (730) is axially displaceable in a central boring and either releases or interrupts the flow of fuel to the outlet aperture (710), depending on the axial position of the needle. A control unit (600) is arranged above the nozzle or jet (700), with a guide boring (620) provided for a transmission element (630,650) for transmission of the adjustment movement of an actuator (100) on to the jet needle (730). A high pressure channel (320,610) discharges into the space formed by the guide boring (620) and the jet or nozzle (700) boring.

Abstract (de)

Injektor für eine Einspritzanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine, wobei der Hochdruckkanal (320) für die Zuführung von Kraftstoff oberhalb des Düsenkörpers (700) in eine zentrische Bohrung (620) mündet, über die der Kraftstoff zu dem Düsenkörper (700) weitergeleitet wird, so daß im unteren Bereich des Injektors auf einen separaten Hochdruckkanal verzichtet werden kann, wodurch der konstruktive Gestaltungsspielraum für den Düsenkörper (700) vergrößert und die Druckfestigkeit des Injektors erhöht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/162 (2013.01); F02M 61/163 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026393 A2 20000809; EP 1026393 A3 20030507; DE 19904720 A1 20000817; DE 19904720 C2 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041030

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/12 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI