Global Patent Index - EP 1026400 A2

EP 1026400 A2 2000-08-09 - Gerotor motor

Title (en)

Gerotor motor

Title (de)

Innenzahnradmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur à engrenage intérieur

Publication

EP 1026400 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102388 A

Priority

US 24526199 A

Abstract (en)

A gerotor motor of the type having an end cap (13), and a stationary valve plate (15) disposed adjacent a rearward surface of the gerotor gear set (17). Adjacent a forward surface of the gerotor star (27) is a balancing plate assembly (19) including a radially outer balance plate (73) and a radially inner balance plate (75), the balance plates defining inner (77) and outer (79) profiles, respectively, which are closely spaced apart and are radially inward from the gerotor volume chambers (29) to provide sufficient sealing land. The inner balance plate (75) is biased toward the star end surface (81) by a Belleville washer (87). The end surface (81) of the gerotor star (27) defines individual star tooth surfaces (97), each of which includes a radial fluid passage (99) receiving system pressure, and a fluid passage (101) oriented generally perpendicular to the radial passage, and having a decreasing flow volume in a direction away from the radial passage (99). The fluid flowing through the perpendicular fluid passage (101) substantially reduces the tendency for galling to occur between the end surface of the star and the adjacent surface of the balance plate (75). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F01C 1/08 (2006.01); F01C 1/10 (2006.01); F01C 19/08 (2006.01); F01C 21/00 (2006.01); F01C 21/04 (2006.01); F01C 21/18 (2006.01); F03C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/18 (2013.01); F01C 1/088 (2013.01); F01C 1/105 (2013.01); F01C 19/085 (2013.01); F01C 21/003 (2013.01); F01C 21/04 (2013.01); F03C 2/08 (2013.01); F04C 15/0026 (2013.01); F04C 15/0042 (2013.01); F04C 15/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026400 A2 20000809; EP 1026400 A3 20020220; EP 1026400 B1 20040609; DE 60011319 D1 20040715; DE 60011319 T2 20050623; DE 60031459 D1 20061130; DE 60031459 T2 20070823; EP 1365151 A1 20031126; EP 1365151 B1 20061018; JP 2000230473 A 20000822; JP 4512858 B2 20100728; US 6086345 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011319 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-11-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI