Global Patent Index - EP 1026401 A2

EP 1026401 A2 2000-08-09 - Hydrostatic pump

Title (en)

Hydrostatic pump

Title (de)

Hydrostatische Pumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe hydrostatique

Publication

EP 1026401 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101946 A

Priority

DE 19904339 A

Abstract (en)

The side plate(16) of the pump is loaded by a disc spring(30) in the direction of the displacement chamber, and the pump casing(2) is sealed on the end face side. The displacement component is a vane wheel. A rotor(6) is torsionally fixed on the shaft(4) and supports radially movable vanes(8), the end sections of which lie closely upon the inner circumference of a thrust ring(10) mounted in the pump casing. The side plate is preloaded against the thrust ring and cell wheel by the disc spring.

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist eine hydrostatische Pumpe, insbesondere eine Flügelzellenpumpe, bei der der Verdrängerraum stirnseitig durch einen Gehäusedeckel und eine Seitenscheibe begrenzt ist. Letztere wird über ein Federelement in ihre Anlageposition vorgespannt und bildet den stirnseitigen Abschnitt des Pumpengehäuses für die Flügelzellenpumpe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344; F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0023 (2013.01); F01C 21/108 (2013.01); F04C 2/3442 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3212363 A1 19830210 - GEN MOTORS CORP [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026401 A2 20000809; EP 1026401 A3 20010926; EP 1026401 B1 20030611; DE 19904339 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50002506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50002506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI