Global Patent Index - EP 1026408 A2

EP 1026408 A2 2000-08-09 - Drive device for a transmitting and/or receiving means

Title (en)

Drive device for a transmitting and/or receiving means

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für eine Sende- und/oder Empfangseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement pour un appareil de transmission et/ou de réception

Publication

EP 1026408 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100537 A

Priority

DE 19904942 A

Abstract (en)

The drive device (1) includes a dual acting, preferably hydraulically activated cylinder, which includes a butt (2), and a piston rod (5) revolving around a drive axle (4), which can be linearly output and retracted from a cylinder casing (3,7). The butt and the piston rod are hollow and record a hollow rotation drive shaft (6), with respect to which they are linearly movable. The hollow interior (27) of the rotation drive shaft is sealed facing the work medium of the cylinder, and connecting conductors for the transmitting- and/or reception arrangement are led in the hollow interior.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Antriebsvorrichtung (1) für eine Sende- und/oder Empfangseinrichtung, insbesondere für eine Sonar-Sende- und Empfangseinrichtung auf einem Schiff, mit einem doppeltwirkenden, vorzugsweise hydraulisch betätigbaren Zylinder, der einen Kolben (2) und eine aus einem Zylindergehäuse (3, 7) linear aus- und einfahrbare und um eine Antriebsachse (4) drehbare Kolbenstange (5) umfaßt, wobei der Kolben (2) und die Kolbenstange (5) hohl sind und eine ebenfalls hohle Drehantriebswelle (6) aufnehmen, gegenüber der sie linear verfahrbar sind. Der vorliegenden Erfindung liegt das Problem zugrunde, eine Antriebsvorrichtung bereitzustellen, die eine zuverlässige und widerstandsfähige Verbindung mit der Sende- und/oder Empfangseinrichtung gewährleistet. Das Problem ist dadurch gelöst, daß der hohle Innenraum (27) der Drehantriebswelle (6) gegenüber dem Arbeitsmedium des Zylinders abgedichtet ist und daß im hohlen Innenraum (27) Verbindungsleitungen für die Sende- und/oder Empfangseinrichtung führbar sind. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/14; F15B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/06 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/149 (2013.01); F15B 15/063 (2013.01); F15B 15/1457 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0735276 A1 19961002 - HYDRAULIK TECHNIEK EMMEN BV [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026408 A2 20000809; EP 1026408 A3 20020619; DE 19904942 A1 20000810; DE 19904942 B4 20090604

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 15B 15/14 A, 7F 15B 15/06 B, 7H 01Q 3/00 B, 7H 01Q 3/02 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI