Global Patent Index - EP 1026441 A2

EP 1026441 A2 2000-08-09 - Reflector for a fluorescent lamp

Title (en)

Reflector for a fluorescent lamp

Title (de)

Reflektor für eine Leuchtstofflampe

Title (fr)

Réflecteur pour une lampe fluorescente

Publication

EP 1026441 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102452 A

Priority

DE 19904525 A

Abstract (en)

The reflector (2) encloses the lamp (1) partially and at a distance, has a coating on its side facing the lamp, esp. an oxide coating of oxidised very pure aluminium, and is very highly polished. The reflector is attached to the lamp via at least two clamps (3) partly enclosing the lamp and can be pivoted on the clamps. Each clamp has a fixing knob (5) engaging openings in the reflector to form a shape or force-locking connection.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Reflektor (2) für eine Leuchtstofflampe (1), insbesondere für eine freistrahlende Leuchtstofflampe (1), wobei der Reflektor (2) die Leuchstofflampe (1) im Abstand teilweise umgibt. Der Reflektor (2) weist auf der der Leuchtstofflampe (1) zugewandten Seite eine Schicht (12, 13), insbesondere eine Oxidschicht, aus harteloxiertem Reinstaluminium auf und ist hochglanzverspiegelt ausgeführt. Dieser Reflektor (2) ist über mindestens zwei, die Leuchtstofflampe (1) teilweise umgreifenden, Klammern (3) auf der Leuchtstofflampe (1) befestigt und ist über die Klammern (3) auf der Leuchtstofflampe (1) schwenkbar. Jede Klammer (3) weist an dem dem Reflektor (2) zugewandten Scheitel einen Befestigungsknopf (5) auf, wobei dieser Befestigungsknopf (5) durch im Scheitel des Reflektors (2) vorgesehene Ausnehmungen (4) hindurchgreift und nach einer etwa 90° Verdrehung eine form- bzw. kraftschlüssige Verbindung ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/22 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01); F21V 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/22 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026441 A2 20000809; EP 1026441 A3 20011017; DE 19904525 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI