Global Patent Index - EP 1026452 A3

EP 1026452 A3 2000-08-30 - Ventilating system

Title (en)

Ventilating system

Title (de)

Belüftungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de ventilation

Publication

EP 1026452 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200410 A

Priority

NL 1011238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026452A2] A ventilating system for a building with several enclosed spaces, each having at least one automatically controlled ventilating device which communicates with the surroundings of the building and, depending on the pressure difference over the ventilating device, passes a specific constant throughput, and having a central mechanical exhaust device with a controllable ventilator, in which system per time block a programmable control unit controls the amount of ventilating air per space depending on a stated number of persons present in this space during that time block by controlling the supply devices and the ventilator, and in which system further a sensor placed near the ventilator is present, with which sensor the amount of air drawn in by the ventilator is to be determined, depending on which a control signal is to generated with the control unit, which control signal controls the number of revolutions of the ventilator such that, depending on the total number of persons stated to be present in the building, a constant amount of air is exhausted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; F24F 11/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/0034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4333195 A1 19950330 - SCHOETTLER LUNOS LUEFTUNG [DE]
  • [A] EP 0655587 A2 19950531 - SCHOETTLER LUNOS LUEFTUNG [DE]
  • [A] GB 2318431 A 19980422 - NUAIRE LTD [GB]
  • [A] LUNOS LÜFTUNG GMBH & CO VENTILATOREN KG: "DAS RICHTIGE ZUR RECHTEN ZEIT", MODERNE WOHNUNGSLÜFTUNG, XP002117862, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.baunet.de/lunos/wohnungslueftung.html> [retrieved on 19991006]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026452 A2 20000809; EP 1026452 A3 20000830; EP 1026452 B1 20030903; DE 60004897 D1 20031009; DE 60004897 T2 20040708; NL 1011238 C2 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60004897

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZWAAN ADRIANUS JACOBUS

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALUSTA NATUURLIJKE VENTILATIETECHNIEK B.V.

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004897 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI