Global Patent Index - EP 1026453 A2

EP 1026453 A2 2000-08-09 - Ventilating device with a slotted duct closable by a pivotable valve element

Title (en)

Ventilating device with a slotted duct closable by a pivotable valve element

Title (de)

Lüftungsvorrichtung mit einem geschlitzten Rohr, die mit einem schwenkbaren Ventilelement verschliessbar ist

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation avec une bouche d'aération à fermeture avec un élément de clapet pivotable

Publication

EP 1026453 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200409 A

Priority

NL 1011239 A

Abstract (en)

A ventilating device comprising a housing substantially elongated in the width direction and provided with a slotted ventilating duct which terminates at one end in an outer mouth breaking through a first housing wall part and at its other end in an inner mouth breaking through a second housing wall part, which ventilating duct is at least partly bounded by plate-shaped elements, including a pivotally arranged valve element which is arranged near the inner mouth and can be brought by an operating mechanism from an open position in which the passage of the ventilating duct is at its maximum, via a number of intermediate positions to a position closing the ventilating duct, which valve element is of such design that when the valve element is in an intermediate position the duct passage, viewed in a direction from the outer mouth to the inner mouth, is gradually, that is to say substantially steplessly, reduced by the valve element, as compared with the passage in the open position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/18; E06B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/06 (2006.01); F24F 7/00 (2006.01); F24F 13/18 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/00 (2013.01); E06B 7/06 (2013.01); F24F 13/18 (2013.01); F24F 2007/003 (2013.01); F24F 2013/1446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026453 A2 20000809; EP 1026453 A3 20000830; EP 1026453 B1 20040421; DE 60009964 D1 20040527; NL 1011239 C2 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALUSTA NATUURLIJKE VENTILATIETECHNIEK B.V.

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-04-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-07-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009964 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI