Global Patent Index - EP 1026457 A1

EP 1026457 A1 2000-08-09 - Multi-functional pump housing

Title (en)

Multi-functional pump housing

Title (de)

Multifunktionelles Pumpengehäuse

Title (fr)

Carter de pompe multifonctionnel

Publication

EP 1026457 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830055 A

Priority

EP 99830055 A

Abstract (en)

The subject scroll is obtained using the traditional nylon PA 6.6 strengthened with 30% glass; however its function is no longer that to contain water inside the circulator only, but also to act as a multifunction modular manifold. Such use leads to the following consequences : heating return (inlet to the circulator) heating return (outlet from the circulator toward the exchanger) two alternative seats for the heating by-pass safety valve two-levels heating pressure switch connection to the water gauge (pressure gauge) flexible ramp toward expansion tank automatic air exhaust valve for the hydraulic circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); Y02B 30/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0797057 A2 19970924 - FUGAS SRL [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026457 A1 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18R

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-07-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000531;LV PAYMENT 20000531;SI PAYMENT 20000531

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000531;LV PAYMENT 20000531;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000531