Global Patent Index - EP 1026464 A1

EP 1026464 A1 2000-08-09 - Air separation process by cryogenic distillation

Title (en)

Air separation process by cryogenic distillation

Title (de)

Luftzerlegungverfahren durch Tieftemperaturrektifikation

Title (fr)

Procédé de séparation d'air par distillation cryogénique

Publication

EP 1026464 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400235 A

Priority

FR 9901097 A

Abstract (en)

During cryogenic air distillation, cyclically and at intervals in a second phase, at least part of the plant gas output is sent to first passage(s) to regenerate them. The first air flow is then returned into one or more third passages (C) of the heat exchange system, which have been cleared by the plant gas, leaving them free of all impurities. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding air distillation plant. Preferred features: The first air flow (100) is sent to the heat exchange system (11), at a pressure lower than that at which the second flow (200) enters the second exchanger. At least part of the first airflow cooled in the exchanger, feeds a column (5) operating at a pressure at least 0.5 bar lower than the mean. This column is a mixer-column operating at a pressure between the mean and that of the low pressure column. During the second phase, nitrogen-rich gas from the low- or medium pressure column and/or a gas enriched in oxygen originating from the mixer column and/or a gas rich in argon from an argon column is reheated in the first passage(s) (A) or cools the first flow (100) in the first phase. At least part of the first airflow is extracted at an intermediate point of the heat exchange system (11). A variant method and further operational details, based on the foregoing principles, are described.

Abstract (fr)

Dans un procédé de séparation d'air dans une installation comprenant au moins deux colonnes (1,3), une partie de l'air (100) à une pression intermédiaire se refroidit dans au moins un passage d'un système d'échange thermique qui est régénéré (sont régénérés) par un gaz de l'installation (17,21) qui peut contenir au moins 50 % d'oxygène. Le reste de l'air à la moyenne pression (200) est soit épuré en dehors de système d'échange thermique soit envoyé dans un passage qui est épuré de la même manière. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F25J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04169 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04466 (2013.01); F25J 2200/06 (2013.01); F25J 2205/24 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); Y10S 62/908 (2013.01); Y10S 62/909 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026464 A1 20000809; CA 2297475 A1 20000801; FR 2789162 A1 20000804; FR 2789162 B1 20011109; JP 2000230776 A 20000822; US 6295835 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI