Global patent index - EP 1026467 A2

EP 1026467 A2 2000-08-09 - Plate-like heat exchanger for hot water production and storage

Title (en)

Plate-like heat exchanger for hot water production and storage

Title (de)

Plattenwärmeübertrager für Warmwasserbereitung und -speicherung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques pour préparation et stockage d'eau chaude

Publication

EP 1026467 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250027 A

Priority

DE 19906180 A

Abstract (en)

For hot water preparation and storage, the plate heat transmitter comprises a stack (1) of known heat transmission plates, followed by a second stack (4) of such plates. The second stack differs from the first in that, on the user water side, it has greater profiling and thereby flow gaps than on the hot water side. The two stacks are enclosed by two reinforcing end plates (2,3). The end plate on the first stack supports the connections for hot water forward and back flow together with cold water inflow and warm water outflow. On the other end plate one or more temperature sensors (14) are arranged. The plate heat transmitter is flowed through in counterflow by hot and user water when the valves are opened.

Abstract (de)

Der Plattenwärmeübertrager besteht aus einem Stapel (1) bekannter Wärmeübertragungsplatten, dem ein zweiter Stapel (4) Wärmeübertragungsplatten nachgeordnet ist, die sich vom ersten Stapel (1) dadurch unterscheiden, daß sie auf der Brauchwasserseite (7) größere Profilierungen und damit Fließspalte aufweisen als auf der Heizwasserseite (8). Die beiden Stapel (1,4) werden von zwei verstärkten Endplatten (2,3) eingeschlossen, von denen die am ersten Stapel die Anschlüsse für Heizwasservor- und -rücklauf und Kaltwasserzu- und Warmwasserablauf trägt und an der anderen Endplatte (3) ein oder mehrere Temperaturmeßfühler (14) angeordnet sind. Der Plattenwärmeübertrager wird von den Medien Heiz- und Brauchwasser bei geöffneten Ventilen im Gegenstrom durchflossen. Um die kompakte Bauform bekannter Plattenwärmeübertrager beizubehalten, sieht eine Ausführungsform vor, die Wärmeübertragungsplatten grundsätzlich mit sechs Durchbrüchen (9) auf Kegelstümpfen zu versehen, die in den Eckbereichen zu je drei an den Längsseiten einer Platte angeordnet und wie die Profilierungen zur einen oder anderen Seite einer Platte (13) eingeprägt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01); F28F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/046 (2013.01); F28D 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026467 A2 20000809; EP 1026467 A3 20001213; EP 1026467 B1 20030423; AT 238532 T 20030515; DE 19906180 A1 20000810; DE 19906180 C2 20030206

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100801

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PATENTE *REHBERG LAUER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-05-03 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLXE

- Free Format Text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE AS PROVIDED FOR IN ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 (SEE PUBLICATION IN HEADING XE OF THE PATENT BULLETIN OF 20040202/02) HAS BEEN GRANTED; THE RESTORATION OF THE PATENT HAS BEEN ENTERED IN THE PATENT REGISTER.

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-02 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLXE

- Free Format Text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 HAS BEEN FILED ON 20031118.

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-01-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1026467E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50001824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-02-28 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C3

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI