Global Patent Index - EP 1026468 A1

EP 1026468 A1 2000-08-09 - Heat exchanger, more particularly plate-like heat exchanger for air separating apparatus

Title (en)

Heat exchanger, more particularly plate-like heat exchanger for air separating apparatus

Title (de)

Wärmatauscher, insbesondere Plattenwärmetauscher für Luftzerlegungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, notamment échangeur de chaleur à plaques d'un appareil de séparation d'air

Publication

EP 1026468 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400094 A

Priority

FR 9901098 A

Abstract (en)

Separation between adjacent edges of plates sandwiching corrugations made of at least 80% copper or at least 80% nickel, is 6-8 mm. Preferred features: Separation between the plates exceeds 10 mm. Corresponding cryogenic distillation plant, especially for air, is also claimed. The subject heat exchanger is the principal unit of its type, and is used to cool air to its distillation temperature. The heat exchanger is a sub-cooler. Corresponding air distillation plant includes a first, air-fed column, connected to a second column using a heat exchanger as described

Abstract (fr)

Un échangeur comprend plusieurs plaques (8) en cuivre, nickel ou aluminium ou un alliage de ces métaux séparés par des ondes d'échange en cuivre ou en un alliage de cuivre (6) et deux tôles extérieures (7). La séparation entre les plaques est supérieure à 6 mm, éventuellement 8mm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F25J 3/00; F28F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/08 (2006.01); F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0486 (2013.01); F25J 3/04084 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04218 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04393 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 5/002 (2013.01); F25J 5/005 (2013.01); F28D 9/0068 (2013.01); F28D 9/0093 (2013.01); F28F 3/025 (2013.01); F25J 2250/02 (2013.01); F25J 2290/20 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01); F25J 2290/44 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026468 A1 20000809; AU 1135400 A 20000803; BR 0000231 A 20001114; CA 2295453 A1 20000801; CZ 20000220 A3 20011017; FR 2789165 A1 20000804; FR 2789165 B1 20010309; JP 2000227295 A 20000815; US 6347662 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030916

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI