Global patent index - EP 1026471 A2

EP 1026471 A2 2000-08-09 - Support mechanism for firearms

Title (en)

Support mechanism for firearms

Title (de)

Stütze für Feuerwaffen

Title (fr)

Support pour armes à feu

Publication

EP 1026471 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300664 A

Priority

GB 9902186 A

Abstract (en)

A telescopically retractable or extendable support 11 for a firearm 1, comprising a plurality of telescoping supporting components 17,27. The support is preferably attachable to a firearm so that said support may be telescopically retracted or extended with respect to said firearm. Preferably, the support is substantially telescopically retractable into said firearm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2346202 A 20000802; GB 9902186 D0 19990324; EP 1026471 A2 20000809; EP 1026471 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 41A 23/06 A, 7F 41A 23/10 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI