Global Patent Index - EP 1026472 A2

EP 1026472 A2 2000-08-09 - Hinge mechanism for firearms

Title (en)

Hinge mechanism for firearms

Title (de)

Gelenkmechanismus für Feuerwaffe

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de charnière pour armes à feu

Publication

EP 1026472 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300663 A

Priority

GB 9902187 A

Abstract (en)

An embodiment provides a self-cleaning or clearing hinge mechanism 7 for firearms 1. The hinge 7 may be lockable in at least one predetermined position, and may comprise a self-tightening and/or adjusting lock mechanism 35, 41 operable to lock the hinge 7 in said at least one predetermined position. A further embodiment provides a hinge mechanism 7 for firearms 1 comprising a self-tightening and/or adjusting lock mechanism 35, 41 operable to lock the hinge 7 in at least one predetermined position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41C 23/04; F41A 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41C 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2346203 A 20000802; GB 9902187 D0 19990324; EP 1026472 A2 20000809; EP 1026472 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI