Global Patent Index - EP 1026472 A3

EP 1026472 A3 2001-04-18 - Hinge mechanism for firearms

Title (en)

Hinge mechanism for firearms

Title (de)

Gelenkmechanismus für Feuerwaffe

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de charnière pour armes à feu

Publication

EP 1026472 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300663 A

Priority

GB 9902187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2346203A] A self-cleaning or clearing hinge mechanism (7, Fig. 1) for a firearm (1, Fig. 1) may be lockable in at least one predetermined position and comprise a self tightening and/or adjusting lock mechanism 35, 41, operable to lock the hinge in said at least one predetermined position. Preferably, said hinge mechanism is a self-latching locking mechanism and may include a quick release mechanism 19 to enable the firearm to be quickly converted from a firing configuration to a stowed configuration. A hinge mechanism (7, Fig. 1) for firearms is also provided which comprises a self-tightening and/or adjusting lock mechanism 35, 41, operable to lock the hinge (7, Fig. 1) in at least one predetermined position. A firearm comprising either of said hinge mechanisms is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41C 23/04; F41A 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41C 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] US 4271623 A 19810609 - BERETTA PIER C

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2346203 A 20000802; GB 9902187 D0 19990324; EP 1026472 A2 20000809; EP 1026472 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI