Global patent index - EP 1026473 A1

EP 1026473 A1 2000-08-09 - Method for creating a decoy target

Title (en)

Method for creating a decoy target

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bereitstellen eines Scheinziels und darin verwendbares Teilkörpergeschoss

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la création d'une cible artificielle

Publication

EP 1026473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108677 A

Priority

  • DE 19617701 A
  • EP 97105393 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing a false target to missiles which comprise a target search head operating simultaneously or serial in an infrared- or radar range, whereby masses emitting an infrared radiation and reflecting a radar radiation, respectively are brought simultaneously and at same place in right position to act as a false target. An ignition- and expulsion unit is arranged at the center of the false target projectile, for activating and distributing the IR effective mass and the radar effective mass in form of dipole packets which are protected against the expulsion heat by a heat shield. An Independent claim is provided for a false target projectile used in the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Bereitstellen eines Scheinziels zum Schutz vor Flugkörpern, die einen im Infrarot (IR)­ oder Radar (RF)­Bereich oder einen in beiden Wellenlängenbereichen gleichzeitig oder seriell operierenden Zielsuchkopf aufweisen, bei dem eine im IR-Bereich Strahlung aussendende und eine RF-Strahlung rückstreuende Masse in der richtigen Position als Scheinziel zur Wirkung gebracht werden, wobei die IR-Wirkmasse und die RF-Wirkmasse simultan und am selben Ort zur Wirkung gebracht werden, wobei über eine Aktivierungs- und Verteilungseinrichtung in Form einer im Täuschkörpergeschoß mittig angeordneten Anzünd- und Ausblaseinheit, um die die Wirkmassen in Längsrichtung des Täuschkörpergeschosses hintereinander angeordnet sind, die IR-Wirkmasse aktiviert und verteilt sowie die RF-Wirkmasse in Form von Dipolpaketen, die durch mindestens ein Hitzeschild vor der Ausblashitze geschützt sind, verwirbelt und verteilt werden, sowie ein in diesen Verfahren verwendbares Täuschkörpergeschoss. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 9/00; F41H 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 2/02 (2006.01); F41H 9/00 (2006.01); F41H 11/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/02 (2013.01); F41H 9/00 (2013.01); F42B 12/70 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 3841219 A 19741015 - SCHILLREFF G
  • COINTRIN-GENEVE: "le systeme franco-britannique sibyl", REVUE INTERNATIONAL DE DEFENSE, BAND 15, NR.10, 1982, GENEVE, pages 1405 - 1408
  • COINTRIN-GENEVE: "cartouche-leurre gemini", REVUE INTERNATIONAL DE DEFENSE, BAND 10, NR. 3, 1997, GENEVE, pages 500
  • COINTRIN-GENEVE: "wallop elargit sa gamme de materials de guerre eletronique", REVUE INTERNATIONAL DE DEFENSE, BAND 15, NR. 12, 1982, GENEVE, pages 1741 - 1744

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805333 A2 19971105; EP 0805333 A3 19980114; EP 0805333 B1 20001108; DE 19617701 A1 19971120; DE 19617701 C2 20000113; DK 0805333 T3 20010205; DK 9900457 U1 19991230; EP 1026473 A1 20000809; EP 1026473 B1 20020807; JP 3181240 B2 20010703; JP H112499 A 19990106; SG 55308 A1 19981221; US 5835051 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59707940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59707940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2014-05-22 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59707940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-04-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59707940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2005-06-08 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: PAINS WESSEX LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030507

2004-09-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: PAINS WESSEX LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-11-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: PAINS WESSEX LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-07-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PAINS WESSEX LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59707940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 805333

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-08-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 805333

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB