Global patent index - EP 1026703 A3

EP 1026703 A3 2001-02-21 - Liquid cooled conductor

Title (en)

Liquid cooled conductor

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlter Leiter

Title (fr)

Conducteur refroidi par liquide

Publication

EP 1026703 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00660014 A

Priority

FI 990209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026703A2] The invention relates to a liquid-cooled conductor, comprising a hollow, electrically conductive part (1). An insulating part (2) comprising at least one coolant flow channel (3) is fitted inside the conducting part (1) and is essentially shaped to the inner surface of the conducting part (1) and forms an electrical insulation between the conducting part (1) and the coolant arranged to flow in the flow channel (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/423 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026703 A2 20000809; EP 1026703 A3 20010221; FI 990209 A0 19990203; FI 990209 A 20000804

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040801

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI