Global patent index - EP 1026716 A1

EP 1026716 A1 2000-08-09 - Electromagnetic relay with enclosing cover

Title (en)

Electromagnetic relay with enclosing cover

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Relais mit aufnehmendem Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Relais électromagnétique à capot enfermant la partie constitutive du relais

Publication

EP 1026716 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400291 A

Priority

FR 9901311 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a permeable cover which allows air circulation without escape of acid. The relay comprises a frame (2) and at least one coil carried on this frame. A mobile armature (9) is mounted to pivot on the frame, and a set of electrical contacts are actuated by the armature. The frame of the relay has a cover attached to the top, this cover plate having a series of apertures so that it is permeable for air and the degassing products emanating from the plastic materials of the relay. The internal face (57) of the relay comprises a condensation surface on which the acid vapour of nitric acid is collected, when this is produced by the combined effects of humidity within the relay and electrical arcing.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un relais électromagnétique. Le relais est du type comportant une culasse (2), au moins une bobine portée par la culasse, une armature mobile (9), un dispositif de contacts électriques actionné sous l'effet du déplacement de l'armature, et un capot (1) enfermant les éléments constitutifs du relais et comportant des ouvertures à travers lesquelles l'intérieur communique avec l'extérieur. Le relais est caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte un capot (1) dont la paroi supérieure est réalisée sous forme d'une plaque (56) perméable à l'air et au gaz produits par dégazage des matières plastiques du relais et dont la face nterne (57) constitue une face de condensation des vapeurs d'acide nitrique produit à l'intérieur du capot en présence d'humidité par les arcs électriques entre les éléments de contact. L'invention est utilisable pour des relais électromagnétiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026716 A1 20000809; FR 2789512 A1 20000811; FR 2789512 B1 20010427

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041007

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI