Global Patent Index - EP 1026717 A1

EP 1026717 A1 2000-08-09 - Relay with an L-shaped yoke and an armature that pivots on the edge of an arm of said yoke

Title (en)

Relay with an L-shaped yoke and an armature that pivots on the edge of an arm of said yoke

Title (de)

Relais mit einem L-förmigen Joch und einem an die Kante eines Schenkels des Joches schwenkbaren Klappanker

Title (fr)

Relais du type à culasse en forme d'un L et à armature mobile montée pivotante sur l'arête d'une branche de la culasse.

Publication

EP 1026717 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400292 A

Priority

FR 9901310 A

Abstract (en)

The elastic anti-remanent element inserted between core and armature encourages a rapid response from the relay. The relay comprises a frame (2) formed in a L-shape, attached to an insulating base. One branch of the L-shape carries a core for a coil generating a magnetic flux. An armature (9) is mounted to pivot on the end of the other branch, with an anti-remanent element (13) inserted between the core and the branch of the L-shape. The armature includes a number of arms (25) which activate the mobile lamellae (46) of mobile contacts (48,48') which co-operate with fixed contacts (49,49'). The anti-remanent element is made as a plate of an elastically deformable material, deforming when the armature is applied to the front face (12) of the core (6), and providing a return spring when the armature returns to its rest position.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un relais électromagnétique. Le relais est du type comportant une culasse (2) en forme d'un L, fixée sur un socle isolant (15) et dont une branche porte au moins un noyau porteur d'une bobine générateur d'un flux magnétique, une armature (9) montée pivotante sur l'extrémité de l'autre branche de la culasse, avec interposition d'un élément antirémanent (13), et porteuse d'une pluralité de bras (25) d'actionnement de lames mobiles (46) porteuses d'un élément de contact mobile (48, 48') destiné à coopérer avec un élément de contact fixe (49, 49'). Le relais est caractérisé en ce que l'élément antirémanent (13) est réalisé sous forme d'une plaquette en un matériau élastiquement déformable lors de l'application de l'armature (2) contre la face frontale (12) du noyau (6) de façon à constituer un moyen de rappel de l'armature (9) dans sa position écartée. L'invention est utilisable pour des relais à réponse rapide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/16; H01H 50/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/16 (2006.01); H01H 50/30 (2006.01); H01H 47/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/163 (2013.01); H01H 50/305 (2013.01); H01H 47/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026717 A1 20000809; EP 1026717 B1 20060111; DE 1026717 T1 20010906; DE 60025454 D1 20060406; DE 60025454 T2 20060817; ES 2254113 T3 20060616; FR 2789513 A1 20000811; FR 2789513 B1 20030606

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254113 T3

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025454 P 20060406

2006-04-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2005-09-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2005-03-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040211

2001-09-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI