Global Patent Index - EP 1026720 A1

EP 1026720 A1 2000-08-09 - Self restoring current limiting device with liquid metal

Title (en)

Self restoring current limiting device with liquid metal

Title (de)

Selbsterholende Strombegrenzungseinrichtung mit Flüssigmetall

Title (fr)

Dispositif limiteur de courant avec métal liquide à auto-régénération

Publication

EP 1026720 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101319 A

Priority

DE 19903940 A

Abstract (en)

The current limiting device includes intermediate walls (12) of open-pore, porous material. A non-conductive liquid (6) rests above a liquid metal (7) and is not mixable or combinable with it. The boiling point of the non-conductive liquid is well below that of the liquid metal and well above the nominal working temperature. The non-conductive liquid borders the intermediate walls by capillary forces as far as connecting channels (8). An Independent claim is included for a self-recovering current limiting device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine selbsterholende Strombegrenzungseinrichtung mit Flüssigmetall. Sie enthält Elektroden (1) und mehrere mit Flüssigmetall (7) teilweise aufgefüllte, hintereinander liegende Verdichterräume (4), die durch druckfeste Isolierkörper (5; 11) und durch diese gehaltene isolierende Zwischenwände (12) mit Verbindungskanälen (8) gebildet werden. Die Zwischenwände (12) bestehen aus einem offenporigen, porösen Material. Über dem Flüssigmetall (7) lagert entweder eine nichtleitende Flüssigkeit (6), die unvermischbar sowie unverbindbar mit dem Flüssigmetall (7) ist, oder ein inertes Schutzgas (16). Durch die Wirkung der Poren gelangt die nichtleitende Flüssigkeit (6) bzw. das Schutzgas (16) in den Zwischenwänden (12 )bis in den Bereich der Verbindungskanäle ( 8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 87/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 87/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 87/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026720 A1 20000809; EP 1026720 B1 20060705; DE 19903940 C1 20001102; DE 50013098 D1 20060817

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-01-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013098 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI