Global patent index - EP 1026725 A2

EP 1026725 A2 2000-08-09 - Manufacturing method for a semiconductor device

Title (en)

Manufacturing method for a semiconductor device

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für eine Halbleitervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication pour un dispositif semiconducteur

Publication

EP 1026725 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300389 A

Priority

JP 2865799 A

Abstract (en)

A manufacturing method for a semiconductor device is provided with the steps of: semi-full dicing a semiconductor wafer so as to leave a dicing residual portion with a predetermined thickness between devices on the semiconductor wafer; forming a protective layer having a chemical etching resistant property on an element formation face of the semiconductor wafer; chemically etching the semiconductor wafer having the protective layer formed on the element formation face from the rear face side so as to polish the rear face of the semiconductor wafer, so as to remove the dicing residual portion to divide the semiconductor wafer into individual semiconductor chips, and so as to remove damaged areas in a cut face of the semiconductor wafer resulted from the semi-full dicing process. Thus, it becomes possible to reduce the number of processes, and also to carry out a polishing process and a dicing process safely without giving damages to the semiconductor wafer and without causing cracks and chips therein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/306 (2006.01); H01L 21/301 (2006.01); H01L 21/68 (2006.01); H01L 21/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/6835 (2013.01); H01L 21/6836 (2013.01); H01L 21/78 (2013.01); H01L 21/30604 (2013.01); H01L 21/30625 (2013.01); H01L 2221/68327 (2013.01); H01L 2221/6834 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026725 A2 20000809; EP 1026725 A3 20030115; JP 2000228389 A 20000815; JP 3447602 B2 20030916; US 6730579 B1 20040504

INPADOC legal status

2011-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110105

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061228

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01L 21/00 A, 7H 01L 21/78 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI