Global Patent Index - EP 1026771 A1

EP 1026771 A1 2000-08-09 - Diplexer for HF signals

Title (en)

Diplexer for HF signals

Title (de)

Diplexer für HF-Signale

Title (fr)

Diplexeur pour signaux HF

Publication

EP 1026771 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100562 A

Priority

DE 29900379 U

Abstract (en)

The diplexer unit (10) is located at the focal point of the satellite dish and handles the transmission of signals between an emitter and a receiver (7). The unit has a pair of coaxial waveguides (11,13) configured as a coaxial cable. A strip conductor (40) is used to decouple the second signal from the second waveguide.

Abstract (de)

Ein zum Übertragen von HF-Signalen zwischen einem Strahler (1) und einer Sende- und/oder Empfangseinheit (7) vorgesehener Diplexer hat einen ersten Wellenleiter (11;111) zum Führen eines ersten Signals, der zwischen Strahler (1) und Sende- und/oder Empfangseinheit (7) anschließbar ist, einen als Koaxialleiter ausgebildeten zweiten Wellenleiter (13;113) zum Führen eines zweiten Signales, der an den Strahler (1) anschließbar ist, wobei der erste Wellenleiter (11;111) den Innenleiter des zweiten Wellenleiters (13;113) bildet, und einen Streifenleiter (40;118) zum Auskoppeln des zweiten Signales aus dem zweiten Wellenleiter zum Anschluß an die Sende und/oder Empfangseinheit (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0556941 A1 19930825 - E SYSTEMS INC [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 706 (E - 1483) 22 December 1993 (1993-12-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900379 U1 20000525; EP 1026771 A1 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI