Global Patent Index - EP 1026774 A3

EP 1026774 A3 2000-08-30 - Antenna for wireless operated communication terminals

Title (en)

Antenna for wireless operated communication terminals

Title (de)

Antenne für funkbetriebene Kommunikationsendgeräte

Title (fr)

Antenne pour terminaux de radiocommunication sans fil

Publication

EP 1026774 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100923 A

Priority

DE 19903005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026774A2] The antenna includes a planar inverted F-antenna with a feeding point and one or several earth connections. The antenna determines with its size the lower emission frequency and has one or several notches or graduations in its lateral direction. One or several geometrical paths are provided which are composed of straight or bent single paths and which extend from the feeding point to another corner provided by the notches, graduations or form changes. Emitted waves are formed with a higher frequency than the predetermined lower frequency. Preferably, a separated earth plate is allocated to the antenna.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0471 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 5/357 (2013.01); H01Q 5/364 (2013.01); H01Q 5/371 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0892459 A1 19990120 - NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]
  • [A] WO 9849743 A1 19981105 - MOTECO AB [SE], et al
  • [A] WO 9849742 A1 19981105 - MOTECO AB [SE], et al
  • [EPA] WO 9943045 A1 19990826 - QUALCOMM INC [US]
  • [PA] US 5926139 A 19990720 - KORISCH ILYA A [US]
  • [X] LIU Z D ET AL: "DUAL-FREQUENCY PLANAR INVERTED-F ANTENNA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 45, no. 10, 1 October 1997 (1997-10-01), pages 1451 - 1457, XP000702475, ISSN: 0018-926X
  • [A] ROWELL C R ET AL: "A COMPACT PIFA SUITABLE FOR DUAL-FREQUENCY 900/1800-MHZ OPERATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 46, no. 4, 1 April 1998 (1998-04-01), pages 596 - 598, XP000750738, ISSN: 0018-926X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026774 A2 20000809; EP 1026774 A3 20000830; US 2001050635 A1 20011213; US 6483462 B2 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIGASET COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIGASET COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI