Global Patent Index - EP 1026775 A1

EP 1026775 A1 2000-08-09 - Antenna set for a satellite mobile phone and a mobile equipped with this antenna system

Title (en)

Antenna set for a satellite mobile phone and a mobile equipped with this antenna system

Title (de)

Antennenanordnung für mobiles Satellitentelefon und Mobil telefon mit dieser Antennenanordnung

Title (fr)

Système d'antenne de téléphone mobile pour satellite et téléphone mobile muni de ce système d'antenne

Publication

EP 1026775 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00200065 A

Priority

FR 9900526 A

Abstract (en)

The switched mode mobile telephone spiral antenna creates radiation patterns to receive rotating polar satellite communications. The conical section spiral antenna has several sets of turns (B1-B4) together with a switching mode function (m1,m2) providing a vertical radiating or horizontal radiating pattern. The pattern can be switched before or after satellite signal losses.

Abstract (fr)

Le système d'antenne pour téléphone mobile cellulaire fonctionne par liaison radioélectrique entre le mobile (1) et un ensemble de satellites (2) tournant en orbite polaire ou quasi polaire autour de la Terre. Selon l'invention l'antenne (3), qui est à polarisation circulaire sous forme d'une antenne conique à plusieurs brins, comporte à sa base des moyens de commutation de mode de fonctionnement (11) solidaires du téléphone mobile, la commutation étant effectuée automatiquement selon certains critères de choix, parmi deux modes de fonctionnement possibles (m1, m2), ces critères étant posés a priori ou a posteriori. Application : téléphonie mobile par satellite. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/36; H01Q 9/27; H01Q 11/08; H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/30 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 11/08 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 11/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026775 A1 20000809; EP 1026775 B1 20060426; CN 1185763 C 20050119; CN 1261210 A 20000726; DE 60027491 D1 20060601; DE 60027491 T2 20061207; JP 2000232312 A 20000822; KR 100693932 B1 20070312; KR 20000053518 A 20000825; US 6208302 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60027491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-08-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CALLAHAN CELLULAR L.L.C., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130724

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CALLAHAN CELLULAR L.L.C., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60027491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-04-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60027491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-02-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60027491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

2012-12-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121108 AND 20121114

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-12-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60027491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOB, HERVE,SOCIETE CIVILE SPID

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050420

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOB, HERVE, SOCIETE CIVILE SPID

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI