Global patent index - EP 1026786 A1

EP 1026786 A1 2000-08-09 - Grounded electrical connector with tail aligner

Title (en)

Grounded electrical connector with tail aligner

Title (de)

Geerdeter Elektrischer Verbinder mit Kontaktfahnenausrichtung

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique mis à la terre avec une partie pour aligner

Publication

EP 1026786 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102042 A

Priority

US 24494999 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector (20) is adapted for mounting on a printed circuit board. The connector includes a dielectric housing (76) having a forward mating end (80) and a rear terminating end (82), with a plurality of terminal-receiving passages (84) extending therebetween. A plurality of terminals (86) are received in the passages and include tail portions (86c,86d) projecting from the housing. At least one ground member (88) is mounted on the housing and includes a ground contact arm (86c) projecting forwardly for engaging a complementary mating connector. An ESD clip (88d) projects downwardly from the ground member for insertion into an appropriate mounting hole in the printed circuit board. A tail aligner (90) is mounted to the rear end of the housing and has a plurality of apertures (90c) through which the end portions of the terminals extend. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20; H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 13/652 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026786 A1 20000809; EP 1026786 B1 20031008; CN 1258837 C 20060607; CN 1264192 A 20000823; DE 60005719 D1 20031113; DE 60005719 T2 20040715; JP 2000228259 A 20000815; JP 3194229 B2 20010730; SG 97835 A1 20030820; TW 450460 U 20010811; US 6287146 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60005719

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI