Global Patent Index - EP 1026791 A2

EP 1026791 A2 2000-08-09 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1026791 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102468 A

Priority

DE 19905043 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has two pluggable parts with contacts (17;15) and a shorting bar (19) which can be selectively connected to contacts (17) of one connector part (11). At least one contact (15) of one connector part (11) is formed as a pre-contact which allows an electrical potential to be established between the two connector parts prior to the creation of an electrical contact between the shorting contacts (17) and the corresponding contacts. An Independent claim is included for a method of producing a multi-pin electrical contact between two connector parts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen mehrpoligen elektrischen Steckverbinder mit zwei zusammensteckbaren Verbinderteilen, die jeweils mehrere einander entsprechende Kontaktelemente aufweisen, sowie mit wenigstens einer elektrisch leitenden Kurzschlußbrücke, die wahlweise mit Kontaktelementen eines Verbinderteils (Kurzschluß- Kontaktelemente) in elektrischen Kontakt bringbar oder von den Kurzschluß-Kontaktelementen lösbar ist, wobei wenigstens ein Kontaktelement eines Verbinderteils als ein Vorkontaktelement ausgebildet ist, über das im Falle des Verbindens der beiden Verbinderteile noch vor der Erzeugung eines elektrischen Kontakts zwischen den Kurzschluß-Kontaktelementen und den hierzu entsprechenden Kontaktelementen ein elektrisches Potential zwischen den beiden Verbinderteilen übertragbar ist. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein entsprechendes Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines mehrpoligen elektrischen Kontakts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/703 (2013.01); H01R 24/62 (2013.01); H01R 2107/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026791 A2 20000809; EP 1026791 A3 20010808; EP 1026791 B1 20070509; DE 19905043 A1 20000810; DE 50014309 D1 20070621

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080204

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-12-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014309 P 20070621

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI