Global Patent Index - EP 1026793 A1

EP 1026793 A1 2000-08-09 - Connection assembly for a circuit breaker

Title (en)

Connection assembly for a circuit breaker

Title (de)

Verbindungsanordnung für einen Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connexion pour un disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1026793 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410002 A

Priority

FR 9901525 A

Abstract (en)

The plug and socket have shaped corners, determining specific possible combinations. The connection for a circuit breaker comprises a fixed socket (D) mounted on the circuit breaker, and a mobile terminal (C) connected to auxiliary measuring components. The fixed socket (D) includes three phase connectors (Dx, Dy, Dz) and a neutral connector (DN).. The fixed socket has four locations, and the mobile socket has four corresponding projecting pins which are shaped in cross-section to limit their ability to fit into selected locations. The mobile connector is such that it can be inserted in one of two different positions, by rotation about its longitudinal axis.

Abstract (fr)

L'ensemble de connexion est destiné à connecter un déclencheur électronique à des auxiliaires de mesure associés aux conducteurs d'un réseau électrique polyphasé avec neutre à p phases. L'ensemble comporte une prise fixe D montée sur le déclencheur et une prise mobile C reliée aux auxiliaires de mesure. La prise fixe comporte p connecteurs de phase DX, DY, DZ et un connecteur de neutre DN. La prise mobile comporte p+1 connecteurs C1, C2, C3, C4, complémentaires des bornes du connecteur fixe. Suivant l'emplacement du conducteur de ligne de neutre, à droite ou à gauche des conducteurs de phase en C1 ou C4, un simple pivotement angulaire de la prise mobile (C, C') permet de faire coïncider le connecteur de neutre de la prise mobile avec celui de la prise fixe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 29/00; H01R 13/642

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 29/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/642 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 29/00 (2013.01); H01R 13/642 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026793 A1 20000809; EP 1026793 B1 20081105; DE 60040702 D1 20081218; FR 2789524 A1 20000811; FR 2789524 B1 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170117

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60040702

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090806

2009-04-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2008-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040702 P 20081218

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2008-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070727

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI