Global Patent Index - EP 1026828 A1

EP 1026828 A1 2000-08-09 - Generating a control signal for an electrical device with the aid of keys

Title (en)

Generating a control signal for an electrical device with the aid of keys

Title (de)

Erzeugung eines Steuersignals für eine elektrische Vorrichtung mit Hilfe von Tasten

Title (fr)

Génération d'un signal de commande pour un dispositif électrique à l'aide de touches

Publication

EP 1026828 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00101741 A

Priority

FI 990214 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical circuitry related to the user interface of an electrical device, whereby the circuitry comprises key members for generating input signals (103), and two sub-circuitries, of which the first one (102) is arranged to generate said input signals when said key members are pressed. This electrical circuitry is characterised in that said key members comprise second key members for generating a control signal (109), and that said first sub-circuitry (102) is arranged to generate a certain delay signal when said second key members are pressed in a certain manner, and to deactivate said delay signal when certain key members belonging to the second key members are not pressed anymore. Further said electrical circuitry is characterised in that the second sub-circuitry (105) comprises a delay block (106) which is arranged to activate a certain generating signal (108), if the activation time of said delay signal exceeds a certain threshold time, and a control signal generating block (107) which is arranged to generate a control signal when said generating signal is activated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03M 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03M 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5258748 A 19931102 - JONES ROBERT W [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 095 (P - 1493) 25 February 1993 (1993-02-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 401 (E - 0971) 30 August 1990 (1990-08-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026828 A1 20000809; EP 1026828 B1 20051012; DE 60023047 D1 20051117; DE 60023047 T2 20060518; FI 990214 A0 19990204; FI 990214 A 20000805

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY, FI

- Effective date: 20170109

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY, FI

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOKIA CORP., 02610 ESPOO, FI

- Document: DE 60023047

2015-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60023047

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-10-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150910 AND 20150916

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023047 P 20051117

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI